TN HB1981 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates new categories of emergency first responders to assist EMTs in responding to emergencies, driving ambulances, and engaging in limited medical interventions; requires such persons to become licensed EMTs within a certain period of time. - Amends TCA Title 55 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55 and Title 68, relative to ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1012 | |
2022-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar #2 for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1966 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-11 - Effective date(s) 05/09/2022