TN SB1958 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a local board of education or charter school governing body to implement, as part of the LEA's or public charter school's discipline policy, holistic programs of positive behavior reinforcement and reward-based behavior modification systems. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to student discipline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934 | |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1930 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022