TN SB1953 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 967
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 967
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the present law provisions governing overtaking on the right in regard to the operation of mass transit buses on shoulders and rights-of-way. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 65.
Title
As enacted, revises the present law provisions governing overtaking on the right in regard to the operation of mass transit buses on shoulders and rights-of-way. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 54; Title 55; Title 64 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 967 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 1 (Amendment 3 - HA1152) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0963) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 10, PNV 1 |
2016-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0658) |
2016-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1152) |
2016-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0963) |
2016-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0542) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0762) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Voice Vote Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/8/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2022 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 967