TN SB1942 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the clerk to submit a report by July 1, 2016, and quarterly thereafter, to the office of local government; requires the report to identify applicants for a mobile vendor’s permit who fail to provide the county clerk with the appropriate vendor and vehicle information. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 62 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the clerk to submit a report by July 1, 2016, and quarterly thereafter, to the office of local government; requires the report to identify applicants for a mobile vendor’s permit who fail to provide the county clerk with the appropriate vendor and vehicle information. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 55; Title 62 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0519) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2345 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee