TN SB1932 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an annual training pay bonus supplement for eligible emergency medical services personnel in the amount of $800. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3, relative to ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2027 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee