TN HB2027 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an annual training pay bonus supplement for eligible emergency medical services personnel in the amount of $800. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3, relative to ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1932 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022