TN SB1912 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the expenditure of state funds by the University of Tennessee to promote the use of gender neutral pronouns, to promote or inhibit the celebration of religious holidays, or to fund or support sex week; specifies that all funds in the budget of the office for diversity and inclusion at UT Knoxville, for fiscal year 2016-2017, be reallocated in the university's budget and used by the university solely for scholarships to be awarded through a minority engineering scholarship program; any such funds that are not used for minority engineering scholarships in fiscal year 2016-2017 will remain in the scholarship program for use in future fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the expenditure of state funds by the University of Tennessee to promote the use of gender neutral pronouns, to promote or inhibit the celebration of religious holidays, or to fund or support sex week; specifies that all funds in the budget of the office for diversity and inclusion at UT Knoxville, for fiscal year 2016-2017, be reallocated in the university's budget and used by the university solely for scholarships to be awarded through a minority engineering scholarship program; any such funds that are not used for minority engineering scholarships in fiscal year 2016-2017 will remain in the scholarship program for use in future fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1066 | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to final calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2248 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1066