TN HB2248 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1066
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the expenditure of state funds by the University of Tennessee to promote the use of gender neutral pronouns, to promote or inhibit the celebration of religious holidays, or to fund or support sex week; specifies that all funds in the budget of the office for diversity and inclusion at UT Knoxville, for fiscal year 2016-2017, be reallocated in the university's budget and used by the university solely for scholarships to be awarded through a minority engineering scholarship program; any such funds that are not used for minority engineering scholarships in fiscal year 2016-2017 will remain in the scholarship program for use in future fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the expenditure of state funds by the University of Tennessee to promote the use of gender neutral pronouns, to promote or inhibit the celebration of religious holidays, or to fund or support sex week; specifies that all funds in the budget of the office for diversity and inclusion at UT Knoxville, for fiscal year 2016-2017, be reallocated in the university's budget and used by the university solely for scholarships to be awarded through a minority engineering scholarship program; any such funds that are not used for minority engineering scholarships in fiscal year 2016-2017 will remain in the scholarship program for use in future fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Conference Committee Report (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LIMIT DEBATE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 47 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Brooks K. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Brooks K. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 58 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 56 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LIMIT DEBATE AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 47 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Brooks K. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Brooks K. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1066 | |
2016-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2016 | |
2016-05-20 | Returned by Governor without signature. | |
2016-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, ayes 22 nays 3 |
2016-04-21 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 63, Nays 21 PNV 1 |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference committee appointed. (Gardenhire, Briggs, Tate) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed (M.Hill, Van Huss, Fitzhugh) |
2016-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment #1 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-20 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA1 HB2248 |
2016-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 3 for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 4 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1020) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 22, PNV 0 |
2016-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1159) |
2016-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA1207) |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1051) |
2016-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0929) |
2016-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1912 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1066