TN SB1900 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, encourages LEAs to seek free or reduced cost dental screenings and examinations for children who are unable to afford the screening or exam. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, encourages LEAs to seek free or reduced cost dental screenings and examinations for children who are unable to afford the screening or exam. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2213 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1900&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1900.pdf |