TN HB2213 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, encourages LEAs to seek free or reduced cost dental screenings and examinations for children who are unable to afford the screening or exam. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, encourages LEAs to seek free or reduced cost dental screenings and examinations for children who are unable to afford the screening or exam. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Edcuation |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1900 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2213&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2213.pdf |