TN SB1813 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides a working families' tax refund for state and local sales and use tax paid on or after January 1, 2024, by low-income taxpayers who are eligible for the federal earned income tax credit. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to tax relief for low-income taxpayers.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2942 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024