TN SB1813 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA to install technology on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet; requires each LEA to review its internet acceptable use policy and the technology installed on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet no later than January 1, 2021, and at least once every three years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires each LEA to install technology on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet; requires each LEA to review its internet acceptable use policy and the technology installed on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet no later than January 1, 2021, and at least once every three years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1855 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration