TN HB1855 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA to install technology on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet; requires each LEA to review its internet acceptable use policy and the technology installed on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet no later than January 1, 2021, and at least once every three years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires each LEA to install technology on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet; requires each LEA to review its internet acceptable use policy and the technology installed on its computers to filter or block inappropriate websites and information otherwise accessible through the internet no later than January 1, 2021, and at least once every three years thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0772) |
2020-06-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0607) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1813 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee