TN SB1797 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 997
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 997
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Public Safety Behavioral Health Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 50; Title 58; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Public Safety Behavioral Health Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 50; Title 58; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 997 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1272) |
2018-04-24 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0727) |
2018-04-24 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-23 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1018) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0673) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1510 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997