TN HB1510 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-21)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Public Safety Behavioral Health Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 50; Title 58; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Public Safety Behavioral Health Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 50; Title 58; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 997
2018-04-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
2018-04-03HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/4/2018
2018-03-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
2018-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/28/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-03-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018
2018-02-20HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 2/27/2018
2018-02-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-14HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018
2018-02-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2018-02-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-02-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2018-01-17HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2018-01-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-10HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1797 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 997

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback