TN SB1796 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits marketplace platforms from keeping tips intended for marketplace contractors. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Title
As enacted, prohibits marketplace platforms from keeping tips intended for marketplace contractors. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 788 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 10/01/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0851) |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 17, PNV 7 |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0851) |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1862 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 788