TN HB1862 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits marketplace platforms from keeping tips intended for marketplace contractors. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Title
As enacted, prohibits marketplace platforms from keeping tips intended for marketplace contractors. - Amends TCA Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Mike Stewart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 788 | |
2020-06-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1796 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 788