TN SB1768 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires department of safety to provide photo identification license free of charge to person whose driver license is revoked or suspended upon surrender of driver license or proof of surrender. - Amends TCA Section 40-24-105 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, requires department of safety to provide photo identification license free of charge to person whose driver license is revoked or suspended upon surrender of driver license or proof of surrender. - Amends TCA Section 40-24-105 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1965 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee