TN SB1761 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a court clerk to charge a printing fee of 50 cents per page for electronic filings for the purpose of printing a paper copy of the filing to be kept in the clerk's file; prohibits charging the fee in the case of party who is indigent. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 21, relative to fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/1/2022 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1768 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee