TN HB1768 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a court clerk to charge a printing fee of 50 cents per page for electronic filings for the purpose of printing a paper copy of the filing to be kept in the clerk's file; prohibits charging the fee in the case of party who is indigent. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 21, relative to fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1761 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee