TN SB1726 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the TBI to post on its website a publicly accessible list of persons convicted of two or more DUI offenses. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 39 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires the TBI to post on its website a publicly accessible list of persons convicted of two or more DUI offenses. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 39 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1812 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.