TN HB1812 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the TBI to post on its website a publicly accessible list of persons convicted of two or more DUI offenses. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 39 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, requires the TBI to post on its website a publicly accessible list of persons convicted of two or more DUI offenses. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 39 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1726 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee