TN SB1692 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Effective date(s) 05/28/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Effective date(s) 05/28/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Modernization of Towing, Immobilization, and Oversight Normalization (MOTION) Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39; Title 47; Title 48; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 39; Title 47; Title 48; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to parking.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Effective date(s) 05/28/2024, 07/01/2024 | |
2024-05-31 | Pub. Ch. 1017 | |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-05-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0748) |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0747) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0748) |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0747) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0625) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1731 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1017