TN SB1678 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the maximum income that persons 65 and older may have and still be exempt from paying the Hall income tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, increases the maximum income that persons 65 and older may have and still be exempt from paying the Hall income tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1563 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1678&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1678.pdf |