TN SB1660 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Natural Disaster Relief Program to be administered by TEMA. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 2, Part 1, relative to natural disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1795 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee