TN SB1658 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Pr. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Pr. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, reduces the number of readings required for the passage of ordinances by the board of mayor and aldermen from three to two; raises the monetary limit on purchases that do not require competitive bidding from $4,000 to $25,000. - Amends Chapter 158 of the Private Acts of 1927; as amended and rewritten.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 158 of the Private Acts of 1927; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 1 of the Private Acts of 1989; as amended by Chapter 172 of the Private Acts of 1994; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the charter of the City of Springfield.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Pr. Ch. 43 | |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-02-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 2/14/2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2856 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 43