TN SB1627 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that the actual costs of providing services in child and spousal support cases and the clerks of court reimbursement rates be set according to the Study of Actual Costs of Activities by Clerks of Court for Child and Spousal Support Cases and Determination of Actual Costs for Reimbursement by the department of human services - revised report of study dated November 18, 1998; deletes the present law provisions that require the comptroller to conduct a study of the costs and issue a biennial report. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires that the actual costs of providing services in child and spousal support cases and the clerks of court reimbursement rates be set according to the Study of Actual Costs of Activities by Clerks of Court for Child and Spousal Support Cases and Determination of Actual Costs for Reimbursement by the department of human services - revised report of study dated November 18, 1998; deletes the present law provisions that require the comptroller to conduct a study of the costs and issue a biennial report. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 535 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/19/2020 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0545) |
2020-03-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0490) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1634 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 535