TN SB1585 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits contracts for the operation of prison facilities from containing occupancy level guarantees. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, prohibits contracts for the operation of prison facilities from containing occupancy level guarantees. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2237 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee