TN SB1557 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires POST commission to establish by rule how this state will implement the federal "Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2004," relative to the carrying of firearms by qualified and retired law enforcement officers. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, requires POST commission to establish by rule how this state will implement the federal "Law Enforcement Officers Safety Act of 2004," relative to the carrying of firearms by qualified and retired law enforcement officers. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-06 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6-17-09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 3 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee