TN SB1554 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes provision that describes a report by the department of commerce and insurance due on or before January 1, 2014, to the commerce and labor committee of the senate and the business and utilities committee of the house of representatives concerning the department's findings and recommendations concerning the Tennessee works pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 61; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 12; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 61; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to commerce.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage - Fails (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1467 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.