TN HB1467 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes provision that describes a report by the department of commerce and insurance due on or before January 1, 2014, to the commerce and labor committee of the senate and the business and utilities committee of the house of representatives concerning the department's findings and recommendations concerning the Tennessee works pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 61; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 12; Title 43; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 61; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to commerce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-03-16 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcomittee for 3/16/22 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 1/26/2022 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1554 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee