TN SB1549 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, requires the salary of the mayor and commissioners be set by ordinance in conjunction with the annual budget rather than pursuant to fixed amounts in the charter; removes general supervisory authority of the commissioner of finance and taxation over the city library; removes requirement that the city administrator report directly to the mayor and board of commissioners; removes residency requirement for city administrator. - Amends Chapter 48 of the Private Acts of 1919; as amended and rewritten.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 48 of the Private Acts of 1919; as amended and rewritten by Chapter 15 of the Private Acts of 2013; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the City of Niota.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 18 | |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1558 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Pr. Ch. 18