TN SB1464 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0063 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Tenncare Subcommittee