TN HB0063 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Tenncare Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Tenncare Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, reduces the time period from 30 to 15 days for an enrollee or applicant for medical assistance to mail documentation of a material change affecting the enrollee or applicant's TennCare application. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Tenncare Subcommittee |
2019-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1464 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee