TN SB1445 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 39
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel/motel tax from five percent to seven percent; revises the allocation formula. - Amends Chapter 19 of the Private Acts of 1991; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel/motel tax from five percent to seven percent; revises the allocation formula. - Amends Chapter 19 of the Private Acts of 1991; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 39 | |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 1/27/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk - local bill |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1447 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-21 - Pr. Ch. 39