TN SB1440 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-08 - Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, restates tax rate on attending any event at a municipal stadium from an amount not to exceed 10 percent of the ticket price to an amount not to exceed $2.00. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Title
As introduced, restates tax rate on attending any event at a municipal stadium from an amount not to exceed 10 percent of the ticket price to an amount not to exceed $2.00. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1478 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1440&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1440.pdf |