TN SB1421 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the date of the city elections for mayor and council members to coincide with the November general election and extends the present terms of the mayor and council members to expire on the second Monday following the November election in 2015; authorizes property rights voting limited to two persons per parcel. - Amends Chapter 120 of the Private Acts of 1953; as amended and rewritten.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the date of the city elections for mayor and council members to coincide with the November general election and extends the present terms of the mayor and council members to expire on the second Monday following the November election in 2015; authorizes property rights voting limited to two persons per parcel. - Amends Chapter 120 of the Private Acts of 1953; as amended and rewritten.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 18 | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar 2 calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1395 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pr. Ch. 18