TN SB1390 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes from the requirement to obtain a certificate of need the establishment of a satellite emergency department facility by a hospital at a location other than the hospital's main campus; removes cardiac catheterization as a healthcare service requiring a certificate of need. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 34; Title 42; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, removes from the requirement to obtain a certificate of need the establishment of a satellite emergency department facility by a hospital at a location other than the hospital's main campus; removes cardiac catheterization as a healthcare service requiring a certificate of need. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 34; Title 42; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0541 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee