TN SB1377 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes members of the general assembly, duly appointed law enforcement chaplains, and members of the legislative body of a municipality to solemnize marriages; prohibits persons receiving online ordinations from solemnizing the rite of matrimony; requires members of the general assembly who want to solemnize marriage to opt in by filing notice of the member's intention with the office of vital records. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.
Title
As enacted, authorizes members of the general assembly, duly appointed law enforcement chaplains, and members of the legislative body of a municipality to solemnize marriages; prohibits persons receiving online ordinations from solemnizing the rite of matrimony; requires members of the general assembly who want to solemnize marriage to opt in by filing notice of the member's intention with the office of vital records. - Amends TCA Section 36-3-301.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 415 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0213 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 415