TN SB1195 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows the department to post its annual report on its website in lieu of distributing the report to certain persons and entities. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows the department to post its annual report on its website in lieu of distributing the report to certain persons and entities. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-18HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0256)
2019-04-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0196)
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0970 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback