TN HB0970 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that the family life curriculum used in public schools include instruction on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires each local board of education to require that each teacher employed by the board receive a one-time in-service training on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child, which must be accomplished through the viewing of a video recording approved by the LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that the family life curriculum used in public schools include instruction on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires each local board of education to require that each teacher employed by the board receive a one-time in-service training on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child, which must be accomplished through the viewing of a video recording approved by the LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 269
2019-04-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/3/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRef. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1195 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 269

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback