TN SB1195 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that the family life curriculum used in public schools include instruction on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires each local board of education to require that each teacher employed by the board receive a one-time in-service training on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child, which must be accomplished through the viewing of a video recording approved by the LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires that the family life curriculum used in public schools include instruction on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child; requires each local board of education to require that each teacher employed by the board receive a one-time in-service training on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child, which must be accomplished through the viewing of a video recording approved by the LEA. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 269 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0256) |
2019-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0196) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0970 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 269