TN SB1184 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits recovery for medical costs in personal injury or wrongful death actions to amounts paid by or on behalf of the claimant, amounts necessary to satisfy unpaid charges for medical care, and amounts necessary to satisfy future medical charges. - Amends TCA Title 24 and Title 29.
Title
As introduced, limits recovery for medical costs in personal injury or wrongful death actions to amounts paid by or on behalf of the claimant, amounts necessary to satisfy unpaid charges for medical care, and amounts necessary to satisfy future medical charges. - Amends TCA Title 24 and Title 29.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to last cal. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/14/2014 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud. Comm. to first cal. of 2014 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0978 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1184&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1184.pdf |