TN SB1171 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 250
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows permit holders to carry handguns in parks and other public recreation areas owned or operated by local governments except when the property is in use by a school for an athletic event or other school-related activity; prohibits permit holders from carrying handguns in parks and other such areas that are owned or operated by a school; removes authority of local governments to prohibit handguns in parks by posting. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, allows permit holders to carry handguns in parks and other public recreation areas owned or operated by local governments except when the property is in use by a school for an athletic event or other school-related activity; prohibits permit holders from carrying handguns in parks and other such areas that are owned or operated by a school; removes authority of local governments to prohibit handguns in parks by posting. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 250 | |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0995 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 250