TN SB1135 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs commissioner of revenue to establish system of registration for certain owners of four or more commercial vehicles to allow annual registration for all such vehicles to expire on February 28 each year instead of alternate, interval renewal for each vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, directs commissioner of revenue to establish system of registration for certain owners of four or more commercial vehicles to allow annual registration for all such vehicles to expire on February 28 each year instead of alternate, interval renewal for each vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0068 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-20 - Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1135&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1135.pdf |