TN SB1127 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a court from accepting a plea of guilty or no contest to any other offense in exchange for a dismissal of the charge of aggravated rape of a child if the charge against the defendant is supported by eyewitness testimony or DNA evidence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, relative to aggravated rape of a child.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1232 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-10 - Sponsor change.