TN SB1113 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement that a person convicted of a drug offense in a drug-free school zone must serve the entire minimum sentence imposed before being eligible for release on parole. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-432.
Title
As introduced, removes requirement that a person convicted of a drug offense in a drug-free school zone must serve the entire minimum sentence imposed before being eligible for release on parole. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-432.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0821 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn.