TN HB0821 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes requirement that a person convicted of a drug offense in a drug-free school zone must serve the entire minimum sentence imposed before being eligible for release on parole. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-432.
Title
As introduced, removes requirement that a person convicted of a drug offense in a drug-free school zone must serve the entire minimum sentence imposed before being eligible for release on parole. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-432.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Withdrawn. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1113 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee