TN SB1080 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires TACIR to study funding for all non fish and game recreational activities, particularly the use of non-motorized vessels, and submit a report of their findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation or interim reports, to the general assembly no later than December 31, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 69 and Title 70, relative to recreational activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 497 | |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0254) |
2021-05-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0076) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1389 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 497