TN HB1389 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires TACIR to study funding for all non fish and game recreational activities, particularly the use of non-motorized vessels, and submit a report of their findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation or interim reports, to the general assembly no later than December 31, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 69 and Title 70, relative to recreational activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 497 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to TACIR |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1080 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021